VA HB1853 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1853
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Lawyers; client accounts. Repeals the provision prohibiting the Supreme Court of Virginia from adopting a disciplinary rule requiring that lawyers deposit client funds in an interest-bearing account.
Title
Lawyers; client accounts.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 32-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100869D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1853 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3915.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |