VA HB1853 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1853
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lawyers; client accounts. Repeals the provision prohibiting the Supreme Court of Virginia from adopting a disciplinary rule requiring that lawyers deposit client funds in an interest-bearing account. The bill provides that any rule promulgated by the Supreme Court of Virginia requiring attorney participation in the Interest on Lawyers Trust Accounts (IOLTA) program clearly state that an attorney or law firm has no responsibility to remit interest earned to the IOLTA program. Lawyers; client accounts. Repeals the provision prohibiting the Supreme Court of Virginia from adopting a disciplinary rule requiring that lawyers deposit client funds in an interest-bearing account. The bill provides that any rule promulgated by the Supreme Court of Virginia requiring attorney participation in the Interest on Lawyers Trust Accounts (IOLTA) program clearly state that an attorney or law firm has no responsibility to remit interest earned to the IOLTA program.
Title
Lawyers; client accounts.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 35-N) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0342) | |
2021-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 342 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1853ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 35-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (63-Y 35-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #2 by Senator Stuart agreed to |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 by Senator Stuart withdrawn |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (68-Y 32-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (68-Y 32-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100869D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1853 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3915.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |