VA HB1850 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assault and battery; local and regional correctional facility employees; penalty. Adds employees of local or regional correctional facilities to the enhanced penalty provision so that the assault and battery of such an officer who is engaged in the performance of his public duties is a Class 6 felony, with a six-month mandatory minimum term of confinement.
Title
Assault and battery; adds employees of local or regional correctional facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 93-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 93-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748) | |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 748 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1850ER2) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reenrolled |
2013-04-03 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1850ER) |
2013-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Delegates: Albo, Tata, Torian |
2013-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senators: McDougle, Vogel, Lucas |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 93-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate amendment #1 (Finance) rejected by House (0-Y 93-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Senate amendments #'s 1-3 agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102516D |