VA HB1849 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1849
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board of Workforce Development, Department of Labor and Industry, and Department of General Services; apprenticeship training programs; report. Directs the Virginia Board of Workforce Development (the Board), the Department of Labor and Industry (DOLI), and the Department of General Services (DGS) to review the availability of registered apprenticeship programs in the Commonwealth and evaluate the capacity to build a program that would require contractors engaged in construction contracts with public bodies to participate in apprenticeship training programs for each trade or classification of employees engaged in the construction contract. The bill also requires the Board, DOLI, and DGS to evaluate whether a requirement to limit public procurements to bidders with registered apprenticeship programs would assist the construction industry in meeting its workforce needs. The bill permits the Board, DOLI, and DGS to convene a stakeholder advisory group as part of its review. The bill requires the Board, DOLI, and DGS to complete its review and complete any advisory group meetings by September 1, 2021, and to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an executive summary and a report of its findings and recommendations. Virginia Board of Workforce Development, Department of Labor and Industry, and Department of General Services; apprenticeship training programs; report. Directs the Virginia Board of Workforce Development (the Board), the Department of Labor and Industry (DOLI), and the Department of General Services (DGS) to review the availability of registered apprenticeship programs in the Commonwealth and evaluate the capacity to build a program that would require contractors engaged in construction contracts with public bodies to participate in apprenticeship training programs for each trade or classification of employees engaged in the construction contract. The bill also requires the Board, DOLI, and DGS to evaluate whether a requirement to limit public procurements to bidders with registered apprenticeship programs would assist the construction industry in meeting its workforce needs. The bill permits the Board, DOLI, and DGS to convene a stakeholder advisory group as part of its review. The bill requires the Board, DOLI, and DGS to complete its review and complete any advisory group meetings by September 1, 2021, and to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly an executive summary and a report of its findings and recommendations.
Title
Apprenticeship training programs; DOLI, DGS, et al., shall review availability of programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1849H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21104228D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee on General Laws amendments rejected |
2021-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104228D-H1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2021-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101400D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1849 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)