VA HB1844 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Office for Protection and Advocacy; privatization. Makes various technical and other statutory changes necessary to implement the privatization of the Virginia Office for Protection and Advocacy.
Title
Protection and Advocacy, Virginia Office for; privatization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1844ER) |
2013-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103307D-E |
2013-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1844E |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103307D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2664 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 5300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 39.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 39.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 46 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |