VA HB1843 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Presidential primary. Moves the presidential primary date from the second Tuesday in February to the first Tuesday in March. The bill retains the first Tuesday in March as the primary date before the May general election.
Title
Presidential primary; moves date to first Tuesday in March.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 570 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1843ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1843H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104994D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Incorporates HB1667 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104994D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103621D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1246 (Same As) 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
HB1667 (Similar To) 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB1843-Cole) by voice vote
HB1667 (Similar To) 2011-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (HB1843-Cole) by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 544 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 545 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |