VA HB1838 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood Assistance Act Tax Credit program; Board of Education. Requires any neighborhood organization submitting a proposal to the Superintendent of Public Instruction for an allocation of tax credits for the program year beginning July 1, 2017, to include with its proposal a list of all of the localities in which the organization provided services during the 2016 program year. The Department of Education shall aggregate the information and submit it to the Chairmen of the House Committees on Appropriations and Finance, the Senate Committee on Finance, and the Joint Subcommittee to Evaluate Tax Preferences.
Title
Neighborhood Assistance Act tax credits; process of allocating credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0317) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 317 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1838ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105530D-S1 (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1838S1 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105530D-S1 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105530D-S1 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101261D-E |
2017-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1838E |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101261D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Education
Neighborhood Assistance Act
Taxation
Welfare (Social Services)
Education
Neighborhood Assistance Act
Taxation
Welfare (Social Services)