VA HB1832 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Racing Commission; powers and duties; retainage; illegal wagering on horse racing; penalty. Removes the specific percentage on pari-mutuel pools by the licensee and allows the Commission to approve an amount to be so retained as jointly requested by a recognized majority horseman's group and an unlimited licensee. The bill also (i) increases, for wagers placed on simulcast horse races outside of Virginia, the retainage of one and thirty one-hundredths percent of the pool, with five one-hundredths to be distributed to the Virginia Thoroughbred Association for the promotion of breeding in Virginia, and (ii) provides a heightened penalty for illegal wagering on horse racing. In addition, the bill provides that the Commission shall not issue a license to, and shall revoke the license of, an entity that withholds the sale at fair market value to an unlimited licensee of simulcast horse racing signals that such entity sells to other racetracks, satellite facilities, or advance deposit account wagering providers located in or outside of the Commonwealth.
Title
Virginia Racing Commission; authorized restricted wagering facilities, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (86-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732) | |
2011-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 732 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1832ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (86-Y 10-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105500D-S1 (86-Y 10-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105500D-S1 (95-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 8-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1832S1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Vogel agreed to 11105500D-S1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 11105500D-S1 (Vogel) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Committee amendments rejected | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1832H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104436D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104436D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103560D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Gambling, Lotteries, Etc.
Sporting Exhibitions, Events, and Facilities
Trade and Commerce
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Gambling, Lotteries, Etc.
Sporting Exhibitions, Events, and Facilities
Trade and Commerce
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 331.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 334 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 387.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 392 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |