VA HB1828 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land preservation tax credit. Makes several changes to the land preservation tax credit by (i) reducing the maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued in each calendar year from $100 million to $75 million beginning in 2015; (ii) with the exception of credits issued for fee simple interest donations, reducing the maximum amount of the land preservation tax credit that may be claimed in any year from $100,000 in taxable year 2014 to $20,000 in taxable years 2015 and 2016 and $50,000 for each taxable year thereafter; (iii) requiring that a complete application for the tax credit with regard to a conveyance be filed with the Department of Taxation by December 31 of the year following the calendar year of the conveyance; and (iv) prohibiting the Department of Taxation from issuing any tax credit for a donation from any allocation or pool of tax credits attributable to a calendar year prior to the year in which the complete tax credit application for the donation was filed.
Title
Land preservation; tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 2-N) (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 235 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1828ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105207D-S1 (87-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1828S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105207D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105207D-S1 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103287D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1828E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (18-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103287D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1019 (Same As) 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0680)