VA HB1826 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Racing Commission (VRC); powers. Revises the Virginia horse racing statute in light of Colonial Downs' surrender of its unlimited license to own and operate the racetrack in New Kent County and the nine satellite facilities (OTBs) in Virginia. Specifically, the bill (i) revises the definition of licensee to permit any licensee to own or operate a racetrack; (ii) adds a definition of (a) recognized majority horsemen's group to clarify that the VRC determines which organizations represent horse owners and trainers at race meets and (b) significant infrastructure limited licensee (Colonial Downs); (iii) reallocates the source market fee paid by online wagering companies (account wagering) licensed by the VRC for specified and VRC-approved purposes; and (iv) establishes a simulcast escrow fund to allow OTB wagering to continue in absence of a contract between a licensee and a recognized majority horsemen's group. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Racing Commission; powers, definitions, advance deposit account wagering revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N) (Y: 83 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N) (Y: 83 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 731 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1826ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (30-Y 10-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (66-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1826ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (81-Y 19-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1826H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Substitute by Delegate Scott agreed to 15104932D-H2 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15104818D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104932D-H2 (Scott) |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104818D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (18-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103313D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1097 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 378 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 378.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 392 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |