VA SB1097 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Racing Commission (VRC); powers. Revises the Virginia horse racing statute in light of Colonial Downs' surrender of its unlimited license to own and operate the racetrack in New Kent County and the nine satellite facilities (OTBs) in Virginia. Specifically, the bill (i) revises the definition of licensee to permit any licensee to own or operate a racetrack; (ii) adds a definition of (a) recognized majority horsemen's group to clarify that the VRC determines which organizations represent horse owners and trainers at race meets and (b) significant infrastructure limited licensee (Colonial Downs); (iii) reallocates the source market fee paid by online wagering companies (account wagering) licensed by the VRC for specified and VRC-approved purposes; and (iv) establishes a simulcast escrow fund to allow OTB wagering to continue in absence of a contract between a licensee and a recognized majority horsemen's group. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Racing Commission; powers, definitions, advance deposit account wagering revenues.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 25-N 1-A) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Vogel reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Vogel reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1097ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 25-N 1-A) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (71-Y 25-N 1-A) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (29-Y 11-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1097ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House (81-Y 18-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1097S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Vogel rejected |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Vogel reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1097ES1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Vogel agreed to |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104946D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104946D-S1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Assigned GL&T sub: #2 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103456D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1826 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0731)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 378 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 378.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 392 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |