VA HB1823 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1823
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools, child day programs, and certain other programs; carbon monoxide detectors required. Requires each building that was built before 2015 and that houses any public school classroom for students, licensed child day program, or other program that serves preschool-age children to be equipped with at least one carbon monoxide detector.
Title
Public schools, child day programs, and certain other programs; carbon monoxide detectors required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101635D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1823 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 138.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.058 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1705.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |