VA HB1821 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; American Legion. Provides for the issuance of special license plates for veterans who are members of the American Legion.
Title
License plates, special; issuance to veterans who are members of American Legion.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100825D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1821 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1821+hil |