VA HB1819 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0165)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0165)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child support enforcement; fees. Raises from $25 to $35 the fee charged by the State Board of Social Services to individuals who authorize the Department of Social Services to enforce child support obligations but who have never received assistance pursuant to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program. The bill provides that such fee shall be collected and retained from the amount of child support collected annually in excess of $550.
Title
Child support enforcement; fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0165) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 165 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1819ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101797D |