VA HB1817 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1817
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of certified nurse midwives. Expands the categories of practitioners with whom a certified nurse midwife may enter into a practice agreement to include other certified nurse midwives who have practiced for at least two years and allows a certified nurse midwife who has practiced at least 1,000 hours to practice without a practice agreement. The bill also provides that certified nurse midwives shall practice in accordance with regulations of the Boards of Medicine and Nursing and consistent with the Standards for the Practice of Midwifery set by the American College of Nurse-Midwives and shall consult and collaborate with and refer patients to such other health care providers as may be appropriate for the care of the patient. Practice of certified nurse midwives. Expands the categories of practitioners with whom a certified nurse midwife may enter into a practice agreement to include other certified nurse midwives who have practiced for at least two years and allows a certified nurse midwife who has practiced at least 1,000 hours to practice without a practice agreement. The bill also provides that certified nurse midwives shall practice in accordance with regulations of the Boards of Medicine and Nursing and consistent with the Standards for the Practice of Midwifery set by the American College of Nurse-Midwives and shall consult and collaborate with and refer patients to such other health care providers as may be appropriate for the care of the patient.
Title
Certified nurse midwives; practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (89-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (89-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0396) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 396 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1817ER) |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (20-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | VOTE: Agreed To (89-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Conference substitute printed 21200657D-H1 |
2021-02-25 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senators: Locke, Petersen, Kiggans |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | Delegates: Adams, D.M., McQuinn, Robinson |
2021-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2021-02-23 | House | House acceded to request |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 21200234D-S1 (1-Y 97-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 6-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1817S1 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Dunnavant agreed to 21200234D-S1 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21200234D-S1 (Dunnavant) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (15-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102378D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1817 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2957 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2957.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |