VA HB1816 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Land preservation tax credit; allowable time to claim credit. Extends the amount of time a taxpayer is allowed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land preservation tax credit; extends allowable time to claim credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 183 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1816ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1816H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106299D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106299D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2019-01-17HouseRereferred to Finance
2019-01-17HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2019-01-16HouseRead first time
2019-01-14HouseReported from Finance (20-Y 1-N)
2018-12-31HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-12-31HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101586D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581512(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1816
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1816+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1816H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1816ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0183+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0012+HB1816
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H10V0081+HB1816
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2457+HB1816
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0321+HB1816
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1816+HB1816
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0548HB1816+HB1816

Bill Comments

feedback