VA HB1813 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
City of Bedford reversion; special election for certain council members. Requires a special election for members of council for any town that, on July 1, 2013, is both created by a transition from city to town status and enlarged by annexing territory into the town. In an election held on the Tuesday after the first Monday in November 2014, a council member is to be elected to fill the unexpired portion of the term of each council member whose term extends beyond December 31, 2014. The bill provides that no such election is to be held unless the annexation increases the population of the town by more than five percent. The bill also requires the town to conduct a census in order to determine whether the annexation has in fact increased its population by more than five percent.
Title
Bedford, City of, reversion; special election for certain council members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1813ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102246D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1042 (Same As) 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)