VA HB1809 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Powers of the Commonwealth Transportation Board (CTB). Limits the ability of the CTB to reallocate funds from certain local highway projects that are inconsistent with the CTB's Statewide Transportation Plan or the Six-Year Improvement Program.
Title
Commonwealth Transportation Board; powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 569 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1809ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13101653D-E |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1809E |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #4 |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101653D |