VA HB1798 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1798
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Brunswick County school board; appointed school board salaries. Removes the Brunswick County school board from the list of approved member salaries for appointed school boards. The Brunswick County school board is currently an elected school board.
Title
Brunswick County school board; appointed school board salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 20 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 26, 2021 | |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1798ER) |
2021-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-01-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101535D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1798 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
SB1175 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
SB1175 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
SB1175 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)
SB1175 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0081)