VA HB1798 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1798
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Brunswick County school board; appointed school board salaries. Removes the Brunswick County school board from the list of approved member salaries for appointed school boards. The Brunswick County school board is currently an elected school board.
Title
Brunswick County school board; appointed school board salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-01-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-19 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101535D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1798 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)