VA HB1798 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relocation of call centers to a foreign country; notification requirements. Requires the director of each state agency to ensure that new state agency contracts for the performance by a contractor of state business-related call center and customer service work provide that such work shall be performed by the contractor or its agents or subcontractors entirely within the Commonwealth for the contractor's primary call center and customer service workplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Call centers, etc.; procurement of state business-related work.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N) (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenatePassed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 5-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 36-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 36-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1798H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106298D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106298D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 5-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-28HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102838D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
401143(n/a)See Bill Text
401148(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback