VA HB1794 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; collection of overpayments. Authorizes the Virginia Retirement System to collect overpayment of retirement benefits from the retiree's employer under certain conditions.
Title
Retirement System; collection of overpayments.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747) | |
2011-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-15 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1794ER) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-24 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101901D |