VA HB179 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Uninsured motor vehicles; fees. Raises the uninsured motor vehicle fee from $500 to $600.
Title
Uninsured motorists; raises uninsured motor vehicle fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2012-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2012-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100619D |