VA HB1785 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax revenue dedicated for public facility in Town of Wise. Adds the Town of Wise to the list of localities in which a public facility may be constructed or expanded, with the sales and use tax revenue generated in the public facility dedicated to the payment of bonds issued to pay for such construction or expansion.
Title
RS & UT; revenue dedicated for public facility in Town of Wise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 98 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0568) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 568 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1785ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #2 |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100530D |
Subjects
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Public Buildings, Facilities, and Property
Sales and Use Tax
Taxation
Wise, Town of
Public Buildings, Facilities, and Property
Sales and Use Tax
Taxation
Wise, Town of