VA HB1783 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health screening of prisoners in local correctional facilities. Requires that the staff of a local, regional, or community correctional facility screen persons admitted to the facility for mental illness using a scientifically validated instrument identified by the Department of Criminal Justice Services in consultation with the State Board of Corrections and the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill also requires that these entities develop and deliver a training program for employees of such facilities in the administration of such instrument. The bill provides that if the screening indicates that a person may have a mental illness, an assessment of his need for mental services shall be conducted within 72 hours of the time of the screening by a qualified mental health professional.
Title
Prisoners; mental health screening upon admission to a local correctional facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104612D-H1 |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103518D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Commonwealth Public Safety
Correctional Enterprises
Prisoners
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Commonwealth Public Safety
Correctional Enterprises
Prisoners
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction