VA HB178 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial motor vehicles limited to use of certain lanes of Interstate 64; penalty. Allows commercial motor vehicles to travel in the left-most lane of Interstate 64 in the Counties of Albemarle, Augusta, and Nelson except while traveling the area commonly known as Afton Mountain. The bill provides that any operator of a commercial motor vehicle who travels in the left-most lane while in the area commonly known as Afton Mountain is guilty of reckless driving punishable by a fine of $500.
Title
Commercial motor vehicles; limited to use of certain lanes of Interstate 64, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100924D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB178 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB178+hil |