VA HB1767 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Wrongful death beneficiaries; parents who received support or services from the deceased for necessaries. Adds parents who received support or services from the deceased for necessaries within 12 months prior to the decedent's death to the primary list of beneficiaries who may receive a distribution of wrongful death damages. The bill applies only to causes of action arising on or after July 1, 2019. This bill is identical to SB 1543.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wrongful death beneficiaries; parents of decedent who receive support or services, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0047)
2019-02-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 47 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019
2019-02-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019
2019-02-11SenateSigned by President
2019-02-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-11HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1767ER)
2019-02-11HouseEnrolled
2019-02-07HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateRead third time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1767H1
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104764D-H1
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104764D-H1
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-24HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-24HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101338D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80153(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1767
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1767+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1767H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1767ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0047+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0010+HB1767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0034+HB1767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1849+HB1767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0177+HB1767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0310HB1767+HB1767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0317HB1767+HB1767
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2565+HB1767

Bill Comments

feedback