VA HB1751 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Forgery; venue. Provides that, in addition to the current forgery venue provisions, forgery may be prosecuted in any county or city where an issuer, acquirer, or account holder sustained a financial loss as a result of the offense. This bill is identical to SB 1050.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forgery; venue for prosecution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046)
2019-02-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 46 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019
2019-02-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019
2019-02-11SenateSigned by President
2019-02-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-11HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1751ER)
2019-02-11HouseEnrolled
2019-02-07HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-04SenateRead third time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePrinted as engrossed 19101000D-E
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1751E
2019-01-24HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-21HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101000D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192245.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1751
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1751+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1751E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1751ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0046+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0003+HB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0011+HB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1848+HB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0201+HB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0310HB1751+HB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0317HB1751+HB1751
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2564+HB1751

Bill Comments

feedback