VA HB1749 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; foreign injuries. Provides that an injured employee is eligible for benefits under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act when a compensable accident happens while the employee is employed outside Virginia if (i) the employment contract was not expressly for services exclusively to be performed outside Virginia and (ii) either the employer's place of business is in Virginia or the employee regularly performs work on the employer's behalf in Virginia and resides in Virginia.
Title
Workers' compensation; foreign injuries.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 6-N) (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100224D |