VA HB1748 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charity health care services; liability protection for administrators. Provides that persons who administer, organize, arrange, or promote the rendering of services to patients of certain clinics shall not be liable to patients of such clinics for any civil damages for any act or omission resulting from the rendering of such services unless the act or omission was the result of such persons' or the clinic's gross negligence or willful misconduct. This bill is identical to SB 981.
Title
Charity health care services; liability protection for administrators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1748ER) |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105290D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1748S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105290D-S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105290D-S1 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101057D |