VA HB1739 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Banks; deposits of securities. Authorizes banks to deposit securities for the purpose of securing deposits of any other state where the bank has a branch office or any agency or political subdivision of such state. Under current law, banks may deposit securities to secure deposits by the Commonwealth and its agencies and political subdivisions.
Title
Banks; security deposits of governmental entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 205 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1739ER) |
2013-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-15 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101728D |