VA HB1731 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local treasurers; recordkeeping. Replaces the term "well-bound book" with "record" relating to local treasurers' required method of recordkeeping and clarifies that warrants include all forms of legal demand instruments.
Title
Treasurers, local; recordkeeping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0031) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 31 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1731ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-18 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101191D |