VA HB1731 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/17)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Joint Commission on Administrative Rules; periodic review of exemptions from the Administrative Process Act. Requires the Joint Commission on Administrative Rules, beginning November 1, 2017, on a schedule to be established by the Commission, to conduct a review of the exemptions authorized by the Administrative Process Act (APA). The bill also requires agencies having APA exemptions, other than the courts, any agency of the Supreme Court, and any agency that by the Constitution of Virginia is expressly granted any of the powers of a court of record, beginning August 1, 2017, to submit a written report to the Joint Commission on Administrative Rules, which report includes the date the exemption was enacted, a summary of the necessity for the exemption, and a summary of any rule or regulation adopted pursuant to the exemption in the immediately preceding two fiscal years. The bill provides that in the event that an agency having an exemption fails to submit the report required, the Joint Commission on Administrative Rules shall recommend to the Governor and the General Assembly that such agency's exemption be discontinued. The bill also requires general notice of the provisions of this requirement to be posted on the Virginia Regulatory Town Hall and published in the Virginia Register of Regulations by the Joint Commission on Administrative Rules to advise agencies of their obligations under the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Commission on Administrative Rules; periodic review of exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-24 - House of Delegates - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House of Delegates - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House of Delegates - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House of Delegates - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House of Delegates - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 678 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1731ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Suetterlein, Ebbin
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Ransone, Head, Plum
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2017-02-23SenateSenate requested conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
2017-02-22HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-21SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-21SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-21SenateRead third time
2017-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1731H1
2017-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104589D-H1
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-04HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104589D-H1
2017-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103577D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224005(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1731
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1731+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1731H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1731ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1104V0040+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0113+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1985+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0149+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0304+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0735HB1731+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0792HB1731+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2705+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0892HB1731+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1021HB1731+HB1731
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2780+HB1731

Bill Comments

feedback