VA HB1730 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Foster care; security freeze on credit report. Requires local departments of social services to request the placement of a security freeze on the credit report or record of any child who has been in foster care for at least six months in order to prevent cases of identity theft and misuse of personal identifying information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care; security freeze on credit report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 677 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1730ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference substitute printed 19107289D-H2
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Reeves, Mason, DeSteph
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Brewer, Hugo, Heretick
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-15SenateAmendment by Senator Reeves agreed to
2019-02-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1730H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105173D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105173D-H1
2019-01-22HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-12-19HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-12-19HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101193D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591444.3(n/a)See Bill Text
632905.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1730
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1730+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1730H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1730H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1730ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0677+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0019+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0205V0002+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0027+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2304+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0172+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0348+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1730+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB1730+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3043+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0846HB1730+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3276+HB1730
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1012HB1730+HB1730

Bill Comments

feedback