VA HB1717 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive plan; transportation. The bill allows the Department of Transportation and a locality to agree on a time period shorter than 90 days for the Department to provide written comments on the locality's transportation plan.
Title
Comprehensive plan; transportation component shall be consistent with Statewide Transportation Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1717ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 13-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (85-Y 13-N) |
2013-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 11-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 11-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 13102257D-E |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1717E |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102257D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1293 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0656)