VA HB1705 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund. Provides that the Fund has a lien on a victim's claim if an award was made from the Fund. The bill also provides that if the defendant pays restitution, and the Fund has made any payments for expenses included in the restitution order, then at the request of the Fund, the entity collecting the restitution must, upon presentation of a written request, pay as much of the restitution collected to the Fund as will reimburse the Fund for its payments.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund; written notice, liability for reasonable charges for services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1705ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 13104977D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1705S1 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104977D-S1 |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104977D-S1 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1705H1 |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104005D-H1 |
2013-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104005D-H1 |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103138D |