VA HB1700 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Early childhood care and education; licensure requirements; certain accredited private school exempt. Provides that child day programs that are affiliated with an accredited private school located west of Sandy Ridge and on the watersheds of Big Sandy River and to which no contributions are made by the Commonwealth shall not be required to obtain licensure to operate in the Commonwealth. Current law exempts only those programs that are offered to children who reside at such private school.
Title
Early childhood care and education; licensure requirements for certain accredited private school.
Sponsors
Del. Mike Cherry [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 285 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1700ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (19-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100793D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1097 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)