VA SB1097 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Early childhood care and education; licensure requirements; certain accredited private school exempt. Provides that child day programs that are affiliated with an accredited private school located west of Sandy Ridge and on the watersheds of Big Sandy River and to which no contributions are made by the Commonwealth shall not be required to obtain licensure to operate in the Commonwealth. Current law exempts only those programs that are offered to children who reside at such private school.
Title
Early childhood care and education; licensure requirements for certain accredited private school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0286) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 286 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1097ER) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (87-Y 12-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed House (87-Y 12-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100922D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1700 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0285)