VA HB1696 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Killing of nuisance species from an automobile. Authorizes killing a nuisance species on private property by the owner of such property or his designee from a stationary automobile or other stationary vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Killing of nuisance species; authorizes shooting, etc., from a stationary automobile.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
2019-02-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1696ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-12SenatePassed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
2019-02-12SenateRead third time
2019-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N)
2019-01-28HousePrinted as engrossed 19101583D-E
2019-01-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1696E
2019-01-28HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-28HouseRead second time
2019-01-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 7-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-12-11HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-12-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101583D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291521(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1696
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1696+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1696E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1696ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0151+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0102V0002+HB1696
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0019+HB1696
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1953+HB1696
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0063+HB1696
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0501HB1696+HB1696
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0521HB1696+HB1696

Bill Comments

feedback