VA HB1693 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
High school family life education curricula; students with intellectual or developmental disabilities. Requires any high school family life education curriculum offered by a local school division to include, at least four times during grades 11 and 12, instruction for students with intellectual or developmental disabilities on a variety of topics, including social skills, self-esteem, sexuality, and rights and responsibilities.
Title
High school family life education curricula; students with intellectual/developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Cheryl Turpin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-25 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2019-01-25 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104672D-H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101531D |