VA HB1692 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995; review of proposals. Requires public entities to post a notice, when they receive a proposal under the PPTA, and allow a 120-day submission period for competing proposals. The bill requires the notice to include information on the proposal and the public comment opportunities. The bill further requires, after negotiations are complete and a decision to award is made, that the public entity post the major business points of the agreement and outline how the public can submit comments.
Title
Public-Private Transportation Act; receipt of competing proposals, disclosure of business points.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 560 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1692ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1692H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104594D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Incorporates HB2258 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104594D-H1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #4 |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102965D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2258 (Similar To) 2013-02-05 - Left in Transportation
SB977 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
SB977 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)