VA HB169 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Lyme disease information disclosure requirement; sunset. Extends to July 1, 2023, the sunset of the provision requiring disclosure of certain information to a patient when a Lyme disease test is ordered. Under current law, the disclosure requirement will expire on July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lyme disease; information disclosure requirement, sunset.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-18 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18HouseStricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2017-12-22HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-12-22HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103474D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback