VA HB1684 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Waiver of extradition; bail. Requires a judge to revoke the bail of any person who waives extradition proceedings in writing and remand such person to custody to await transfer to the demanding state.
Title
Waiver of extradition; a judge is required to revoke bail of any person who waives proceedings, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100921D |