VA HB1681 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax credits; housing choice vouchers; eligible housing areas. Expands the definition of "eligible housing area" for purposes of the housing choice voucher tax credit to include census tracts in the Virginia Beach-Norfolk-Newport News Metropolitan Statistical Area in which less than 10 percent of the population lives below the poverty level. Landlords who rent qualified housing units within such areas are eligible for an income tax credit. Current law only applies to such areas within the Richmond Metropolitan Statistical Area. This bill is identical to SB 1656.
Title
Income tax, state; housing choice vouchers, eligible housing areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 19 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1681ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 8-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-12-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-12-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101630D |