VA HB1680 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; Career and Technical Education Work-Based Learning Guide. Requires the Board of Education to review and revise, in consultation with certain stakeholders and no later than December 1, 2020, its Career and Technical Education Work-Based Learning Guide to expand the opportunities available for students to earn credit for graduation through high-quality, work-based learning experiences or, in the case of agricultural education, supervised agricultural experiences, in addition to job shadowing, mentorships, internships, and externships.
Title
Career and Technical Education Work-Based Learning Guide; Board of Education to review and revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0692) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 692 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1680ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20105594D-E |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1680E |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105594D |