VA HB1675 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Palliative care information and resources. Requires the Department of Health to make information about and resources on palliative care available to the public, health care providers, and health care facilities on its website. This bill is identical to SB 974.
Title
Palliative care information and resources; VDH to make information available on its website.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. C.E. Hayes [D] |
Del. Christopher Peace [R] | Del. Richard Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 98-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 98-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 746 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1675ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Dunnavant, Suetterlein, Barker |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Delegates: Bulova, Garrett, Head |
2017-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2017-02-20 | House | House acceded to request |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 98-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105341D-S1 (2-Y 98-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1675S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105341D-S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105341D-S1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1675H1 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104469D-H1 |
2017-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104469D-H1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101699D |