VA HB1672 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Use of handheld personal communications device; Use of handheld personal communications device; use by the operator of a motor vehicle. Limits the use of a handheld personal communications device or any other electronic device capable of providing a visual display that is in the view of the driver in a normal driving position by the operator of a moving motor vehicle. The bill contains increased penalties if a person, when violating the prohibition on certain uses of such devices when driving, causes physical injury, serious physical injury, or death to another person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handheld personal communications device; use by the operator of a motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House: Incorporated by Transportation (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseLeft in Transportation
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB874-Bourne) by voice vote
2020-01-21HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 20104327D

Same As/Similar To

HB874 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - VOTE: Adoption (71-Y 26-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621078.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback