VA HB1666 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Veterans Services; duties of Commissioner; establishment of advisory committees for veterans care centers. Removes the requirement for the Commissioner of the Department of Veterans Services to establish an advisory committee on the administration of veterans care centers established in the Commonwealth. The bill also contains a technical amendment.
Title
Veterans Services, Department of; duties of Commissioner, establishment of advisory committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 89 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1666ER) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101114D |