VA HB1665 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Financing of clean energy programs; development of optional underwriting guidelines. Expands the requirements of a local ordinance authorizing contracts to provide loans for clean energy improvements. The bill adds water efficiency improvements to the list of improvements for which loans may be offered; allows a locality to contract with a third party to administer the loan program; and requires a locality to identify any administrative fee it intends to impose on participants and sets parameters for the imposition of that fee. The bill also details the priority, enforceability, and other characteristics of the lien, now called a voluntary special assessment lien, that a locality is permitted to place against the property where the clean energy systems are installed. Finally, the bill directs the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy (DMME) to develop optional underwriting guidelines for local loans made to finance clean energy improvements. The bill requires DMME to finalize the guidelines by December 1, 2015, incorporating input from certain groups representing real estate; banking, including community banking; energy efficiency; and other interests or industries and evaluating certain specific criteria.
Title
Financing of clean energy programs; development of optional underwriting guidelines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | House | Stricken from docket by Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2015-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102214D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1665 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1665+hil |