VA HB1660 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study of documents relating to Virginia history and the United States Constitution; Federalist Papers. Adds the Federalist Papers to a list of documents relating to Virginia history and the United States Constitution that are required to be explained and taught to students in public elementary, middle, and high schools. The bill requires the study of each such document to be incorporated into the appropriate Standards of Learning. The bill also requires the Department of Education to report biennially to the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health on how such documents have been incorporated into the appropriate Standards of Learning and into curricula.
Title
Va. history & U.S. Constitution; Federalist Papers are required to be taught & explained to student.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2017-01-27 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2017-01-27 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2017-01-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (13-Y 8-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101328D |